US SB2734 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Oregon and California Land Grant Act of 2014
Title
Oregon and California Land Grant Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-31 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1784 (Related) 2014-12-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 646.
HB1215 (Related) 2013-03-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
HB2488 (Related) 2013-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
SB352 (Related) 2013-06-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
SB1414 (Related) 2013-11-20 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-342.
SB1415 (Related) 2013-11-20 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-342.
SB1544 (Related) 2013-09-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5511 (Related) 2014-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
HB5512 (Related) 2014-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
HB1215 (Related) 2013-03-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
HB2488 (Related) 2013-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
SB352 (Related) 2013-06-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
SB1414 (Related) 2013-11-20 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-342.
SB1415 (Related) 2013-11-20 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-342.
SB1544 (Related) 2013-09-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5511 (Related) 2014-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
HB5512 (Related) 2014-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
Subjects
Capital gains tax
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Dams and canals
Ecology
Electric power generation and transmission
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Fires
Forests, forestry, trees
Government studies and investigations
Income tax rates
Indian lands and resources rights
Lakes and rivers
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Oregon
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Railroads
Water storage
Water use and supply
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Dams and canals
Ecology
Electric power generation and transmission
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Fires
Forests, forestry, trees
Government studies and investigations
Income tax rates
Indian lands and resources rights
Lakes and rivers
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Oregon
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Railroads
Water storage
Water use and supply
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/2734/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s2734/BILLS-113s2734is.pdf |