US SB2800 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 525.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

National Aeronautics and Space Administration Authorization Act of 2019 This bill reauthorizes the National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA) for FY2020. The bill provides for continued use of the International Space Station through 2030 and authorizes NASA programs and activities, including a rocket engine test infrastructure program, a low-Earth orbit commercialization program, a Lunar Discovery Program for lunar science research, a 21st Century Aeronautics Capabilities Initiative, a Skilled Technical Education Outreach Program for secondary school students, and a 21st Century Space Launch Infrastructure Program. NASA shall establish the Planetary Defense Coordination Office to implement a program for surveying threats posed by near-Earth objects equal to or greater than 140 meters in diameter. NASA shall also continue providing opportunities for formal and informal STEM (science, technology, engineering, and mathematics, including computer science) education engagement activities, including under the Established Program to Stimulate Competitive Research (EPSCoR).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Aeronautics and Space Administration Authorization Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-08SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 525.
2020-09-08SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-262.
2019-11-13SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-11-06SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

HB1029 (Related) 2019-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics.
SB381 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2831 (Related) 2019-11-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Subjects

Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Astronomy
Atmospheric science and weather
Aviation and airports
Biological and life sciences
Buy American requirements
China
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Employee hiring
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Florida
Foreign and international corporations
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health information and medical records
Higher education
Intellectual property
International scientific cooperation
Licensing and registrations
Manufacturing
Materials
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Minority education
Minority employment
National Aeronautics and Space Administration
Noise pollution
Nuclear power
Performance measurement
Product development and innovation
Public contracts and procurement
Radiation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Roads and highways
Rural conditions and development
Russia
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
Small business
Solid waste and recycling
Space flight and exploration
Spacecraft and satellites
Student aid and college costs
Technology assessment
Technology transfer and commercialization
Telephone and wireless communication
Trade restrictions
Trade secrets and economic espionage
Transportation costs
Transportation safety and security
User charges and fees
Virginia
Vocational and technical education
Water use and supply

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback