US SB291 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to establish the National Office of New Americans within the Executive Office of the President, and for other purposes.
Title
National Office of New Americans Act
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB572 (Same As) 2021-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB1308 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB433 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1308 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB433 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/291/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s291/BILLS-117s291is.pdf |