US SB3045 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-29 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 500.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-29 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 500.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to issue a subpoena for the production of information to identify and notify an entity that is put at risk by cybersecurity vulnerabilities. Specifically, the bill requires the DHS Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency (CISA) to detect, identify, and receive information about security vulnerabilities relating to critical infrastructure in the information systems and devices of public and private entities. To do this, the bill authorizes CISA, upon identification of a system determined to have such a security vulnerability, to issue a subpoena for the production of information that is necessary to identify and notify the at-risk entity.
Title
Cybersecurity Vulnerability Identification and Notification Act of 2019 Cybersecurity Vulnerability Identification and Notification Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 500. |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-242. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5680 (Related) 2020-01-29 - Ordered to be Reported.
SB4049 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB8309 (Related) 2020-09-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB4049 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB8309 (Related) 2020-09-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Business records
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Evidence and witnesses
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Evidence and witnesses
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications