US SB3063 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to encourage greater community accountability of law enforcement agencies, and for other purposes.
Title
Law Enforcement Trust and Integrity Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7120 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 490.
HR1017 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB7100 (Related) 2020-06-04 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3912 (Related) 2020-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR1017 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB7100 (Related) 2020-06-04 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3912 (Related) 2020-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Child safety and welfare
Community life and organization
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Justice
Detention of persons
Due process and equal protection
Elementary and secondary education
Employee hiring
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Mental health
Monuments and memorials
Pedestrians and bicycling
Performance measurement
Racial and ethnic relations
State and local government operations
Child safety and welfare
Community life and organization
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Justice
Detention of persons
Due process and equal protection
Elementary and secondary education
Employee hiring
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Mental health
Monuments and memorials
Pedestrians and bicycling
Performance measurement
Racial and ethnic relations
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3063/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3063/BILLS-116s3063is.pdf |