US SB308 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 97.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 97.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to end the treatment of the People's Republic of China as a developing nation.
Title
Ending China's Developing Nation Status Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. J.D. Vance [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 97. |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1107 (Related) 2023-03-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.