US SB3105 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-161. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-161. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 456 North Meridian Street in Indianapolis, Indiana, as the "Richard G. Lugar Post Office."
Title
A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 456 North Meridian Street in Indianapolis, Indiana, as the "Richard G. Lugar Post Office".
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-01 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-161. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-09-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4368) |
2020-09-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3105. |
2020-09-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4368-4369) |
2020-09-14 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-12-19 | House | Held at the desk. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-12-19 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7165; text: CR S7165) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3152 (Same As) 2019-10-17 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 248.
SB1759 (Related) 2019-08-02 - Held at the desk.
SB1759 (Related) 2019-08-02 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Indiana
Postal service
Senate
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Indiana
Postal service
Senate