US SB3395 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-275.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-275.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prescribed Burn Approval Act of 2016 (Sec. 3) This bill prohibits the Forest Service from authorizing a prescribed burn (i.e., a planned fire intentionally ignited) on Forest Service land if, for the county or contiguous county in which such land is located, the national fire danger rating system is indicating an extreme fire danger level. Nonetheless, the Forest Service may authorize a prescribed burn under such a condition if it coordinates with the applicable state government and local fire officials. At the end of every fiscal year, the Forest Service shall submit a report that describes: the number and locations of prescribed burns during that fiscal year, and each prescribed burn during that year that was authorized by the Forest Service as an exception under this bill.
Title
Prescribed Burn Approval Act of 2016
Sponsors
Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-14 | House | Became Public Law No: 114-275. |
2016-12-14 | House | Signed by President. |
2016-12-07 | House | Presented to President. |
2016-12-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-12-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7159) |
2016-12-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3395. |
2016-12-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7159-7160) |
2016-12-05 | House | Mr. Lucas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-11-18 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2016-11-18 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2016-11-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2016-11-18 | House | Received in the House. |
2016-11-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-11-17 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6493) |
2016-11-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6493) |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. |