US SB3492 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-276.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-276.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to designate the Traverse City VA Community-Based Outpatient Clinic of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Traverse City, Michigan, as the "Colonel Demas T. Craw VA Clinic". (Sec. 1) This bill designates the Traverse City VA Community-Based Outpatient Clinic of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) in Traverse City, Michigan, as the "Colonel Demas T. Craw VA Clinic."
Title
A bill to designate the Traverse City VA Community-Based Outpatient Clinic of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Traverse City, Michigan, as the "Colonel Demas T. Craw VA Clinic".
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-14 | House | Became Public Law No: 114-276. |
2016-12-14 | House | Signed by President. |
2016-12-08 | House | Presented to President. |
2016-12-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-12-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7245) |
2016-12-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3492. |
2016-12-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7245-7246) |
2016-12-06 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-12-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2016-12-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2016-12-02 | House | Received in the House. |
2016-12-02 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6680-6681; text as passed Senate: CR S6681) |