US SB3964 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the national service laws to prioritize national service programs and projects that are directly related to the response to and recovery from the COVID-19 public health emergency, and for other purposes.
Title
CORPS Act Cultivating Opportunity and Response to the Pandemic through Service Act
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] |
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] |
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1794 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB6702 (Related) 2020-05-05 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1355 (Related) 2019-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3624 (Related) 2020-05-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6702 (Related) 2020-05-05 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1355 (Related) 2019-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3624 (Related) 2020-05-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Adult education and literacy
Aging
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Community life and organization
Congressional oversight
Corporation for National and Community Service
Education programs funding
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Food assistance and relief
Government information and archives
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Higher education
Housing supply and affordability
Income tax exclusion
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Labor and employment
Land use and conservation
Minority health
National and community service
Peace Corps
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local government operations
Student aid and college costs
Temporary and part-time employment
Wages and earnings
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Youth employment and child labor
Aging
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Community life and organization
Congressional oversight
Corporation for National and Community Service
Education programs funding
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Food assistance and relief
Government information and archives
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Higher education
Housing supply and affordability
Income tax exclusion
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Labor and employment
Land use and conservation
Minority health
National and community service
Peace Corps
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local government operations
Student aid and college costs
Temporary and part-time employment
Wages and earnings
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Youth employment and child labor
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3964/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3964/BILLS-116s3964is.pdf |