US SB398 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 630.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 630.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commission to Study the Potential Creation of a National Women's History Museum Act - Establishes the Commission to Study the Potential Creation of a National Women's History Museum. Requires the Commission to: (1) report recommendations for a plan of action for the establishment and maintenance of a National Women's History Museum in Washington, D.C.; (2) develop a fundraising plan to support the establishment, operation, and maintenance of the Museum through public contributions; (3) obtain an independent review of such fundraising plan, including an analysis of the resources necessary to fund the construction of the Museum and its operations and maintenance in perpetuity without reliance on federal funds; and (4) submit a legislative plan of action to establish and construct the Museum. Directs the Commission's recommendations to address issues including the impact of the Museum on regional women history-related museums, whether it should be part of the Smithsonian Institution, and the cost of constructing, operating, and maintaining the Museum and acquiring its collections. Prohibits federal funds from being obligated to carry out this Act.
Title
Commission to Study the Potential Creation of a National Women's History Museum Act
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Kelly Ayotte [R-NH] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Sen. Kay Hagan [D-NC] | Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] |
Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 630. |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Landrieu with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 113-290. |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2013-07-31 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-93. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S945-946) |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S945) |
Same As/Similar To
HB863 (Related) 2014-05-08 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Arts, culture, religion
District of Columbia
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
U.S. history
Women's rights
Arts, culture, religion
District of Columbia
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
U.S. history
Women's rights