US SB4121 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 623.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 623.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to designate the Kol Israel Foundation Holocaust Memorial in Bedford Heights, Ohio, as a national memorial.
Title
A bill to designate the Kol Israel Foundation Holocaust Memorial in Bedford Heights, Ohio, as a national memorial.
Sponsors
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 623. |
2022-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin without amendment. With written report No. 117-246. |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7618 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Received in the Senate.