US SB420 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting Volunteer Firefighters and Emergency Responders Act This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to exclude services rendered by bona-fide volunteers providing firefighting and prevention services, emergency medical services, or ambulance services to a state or local government or a tax-exempt charitable organization from the category of services usually rendered by an employee of an applicable large employer subject to the mandate to provide minimum essential health care coverage under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA), thus exempting such employers from PPACA requirements with respect to such volunteers. The bill defines "bona fide volunteer" as an employee of any government entity and any tax-exempt charitable organization whose only compensation is in the form of: (1) reimbursement for (or reasonable allowance for) reasonable expenses incurred in the performance of volunteer services, or (2) reasonable benefits (including length-of-service awards) and nominal fees customarily paid by similar entities for the services of volunteers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting Volunteer Firefighters and Emergency Responders Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-10SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Same As/Similar To

HB33 (Same As) 2015-03-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1191 (Same As) 2015-05-22 - Became Public Law No: 114-17. (TXT | PDF)
HB2658 (Same As) 2015-06-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback