US SB4306 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to invest in workers and jobs, address important legacy costs in coal country, and drive development of advanced manufacturing and technologies.
Title
Marshall Plan for Coal Country Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB582 (Related) 2019-07-22 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 156.
HB2156 (Related) 2019-10-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 176.
SB150 (Related) 2019-01-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB2156 (Related) 2019-10-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 176.
SB150 (Related) 2019-01-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Bankruptcy
Coal
Congressional oversight
Economic development
Electric power generation and transmission
Employee benefits and pensions
Energy
Environmental technology
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health care coverage and access
Housing and community development funding
Housing finance and home ownership
Income tax credits
Labor standards
Land use and conservation
Medicare
Mining
Pollution liability
Small business
State and local government operations
Student aid and college costs
Unemployment
Wages and earnings
Water quality
Youth employment and child labor
Coal
Congressional oversight
Economic development
Electric power generation and transmission
Employee benefits and pensions
Energy
Environmental technology
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health care coverage and access
Housing and community development funding
Housing finance and home ownership
Income tax credits
Labor standards
Land use and conservation
Medicare
Mining
Pollution liability
Small business
State and local government operations
Student aid and college costs
Unemployment
Wages and earnings
Water quality
Youth employment and child labor
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4306/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4306/BILLS-116s4306is.pdf |