US SB432 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 301.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 301.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate the Nulhegan River and Paul Stream in the State of Vermont for potential addition to the national wild and scenic rivers system, and for other purposes.
Title
Nulhegan River and Paul Stream Wild and Scenic River Study Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 301. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin without amendment. With written report No. 118-149. |
2023-09-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1063 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.