US SB436 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SAFE PLAY Act Supporting Athletes, Families and Educators to Protect the Lives of Athletic Youth Act Amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) to develop public education and awareness materials and resources concerning cardiac health, including: information to increase education and awareness of high risk cardiac conditions and genetic heart rhythm abnormalities that may cause sudden cardiac arrest in children, adolescents, and young adults; sudden cardiac arrest and cardiomyopathy risk assessment worksheets to increase awareness of warning signs of, and increase the likelihood of early detection and treatment of, life-threatening cardiac conditions; training materials for emergency interventions and use of life-saving emergency equipment; and recommendations for how schools, childcare centers, and local youth athletic organizations can develop and implement cardiac emergency response plans. Requires the CDC to: (1) provide for dissemination of such information to school personnel, coaches, and families; and (2) develop data collection methods to determine the degree to which such persons have an understanding of cardiac issues. Directs the Department of Health and Human Services to award grants to enable eligible local educational agencies (LEAs) and schools served by such LEAs to purchase AEDs and implement nationally recognized CPR and AED training courses. Amends the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965 to require a state, as a condition of receiving funds under such Act, to certify that it requires: (1) LEAs to implement a standard plan for concussion safety and management for public schools; (2) public schools to post information on the symptoms of, the risks posed by, and the actions a student should take in response to, a concussion; (3) public school personnel who suspect a student has sustained a concussion in a school-sponsored activity to notify the parents and prohibit the student from participating in such activity until they receive a written release from a health care professional; and (4) a public school's concussion management team to ensure that a student who has sustained a concussion is receiving appropriate academic supports. Directs the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration to develop public education and awareness materials and resources to be disseminated to schools regarding risks from exposure to excessive heat and humidity and recommendations for how to avoid heat-related illness. Requires public schools to develop excessive heat action plans for school-sponsored athletic activities. Requires the CDC to develop guidelines for the development of emergency action plans for youth athletics. Authorizes the Food and Drug Administration to develop information about the ingredients used in energy drinks and their potential side effects, and recommend guidelines for the safe use of such drinks by youth, for dissemination to public schools. Requires the CDC to: (1) expand, intensify, and coordinate its activities regarding cardiac conditions, concussions, and heat-related illnesses among youth athletes; and (2) report on fatalities and catastrophic injuries among youths participating in athletic activities.
Title
SAFE PLAY Act Supporting Athletes, Families and Educators to Protect the Lives of Athletic Youth Act
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB829 (Related) 2015-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
SB988 (Related) 2015-04-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2249-2250; text of measure as introduced: CR S2250-2251)
HB2062 (Related) 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
SB988 (Related) 2015-04-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2249-2250; text of measure as introduced: CR S2250-2251)
HB2062 (Related) 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Atmospheric science and weather
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency communications systems
Emergency medical services and trauma care
First responders and emergency personnel
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Government information and archives
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medical research
Neurological disorders
Nutrition and diet
Research administration and funding
School administration
School athletics
Special education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Atmospheric science and weather
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency communications systems
Emergency medical services and trauma care
First responders and emergency personnel
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Government information and archives
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medical research
Neurological disorders
Nutrition and diet
Research administration and funding
School administration
School athletics
Special education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/436/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s436/BILLS-114s436is.pdf |