US HB2062 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting Student Athletes From Concussions Act of 2015 This bill amends the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965 (ESEA) to condition each state's receipt of ESEA funds, beginning in FY2017, on the state having in effect and enforcing a law or regulation that meets the minimum requirements for the prevention and treatment of concussions set forth in this Act. Each local educational agency must develop and implement a standard plan for concussion safety and management for its public schools that includes: (1) the education of students, parents, and school personnel about concussions through specified activities; (2) specified supports for each student recovering from a concussion; and (3) specified best practices designed to ensure the uniformity of safety standards, treatment, and management. Each public school must post on school grounds and make publicly available on the school website specified information on concussions. If any public school personnel suspects that a student has sustained a concussion during a school-sponsored activity: (1) the student is to be immediately removed from participation in that activity and prohibited from participating in school-sponsored athletic activities until the student submits a written release from a health care professional; and (2) that individual is to report all available information regarding the injury to a concussion management team that will confirm and report to the student's parents the date, time, and type of the injury suffered and any actions taken to treat the student. The school's concussion management team shall consult with and make recommendations to relevant school personnel and the student to ensure that the student is receiving the appropriate academic supports, including: (1) periods of cognitive rest over the course of the school day, (2) modified academic assignments, (3) gradual reintroduction to cognitive demands, and (4) other appropriate academic accommodations or adjustments.
Title
Protecting Student Athletes From Concussions Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education. |
2015-04-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2015-04-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB829 (Related) 2015-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
SB436 (Related) 2015-02-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB436 (Related) 2015-02-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Health promotion and preventive care
Neurological disorders
School administration
School athletics
Special education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Child safety and welfare
Education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Health promotion and preventive care
Neurological disorders
School administration
School athletics
Special education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2062/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2062/BILLS-114hr2062ih.pdf |