US SB446 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the U.S. Geological Survey (USGS) to conduct monitoring, scientific assessments, and research in support of fisheries within the Great Lakes Basin between the United States and Canada. The USGS shall (1) execute a comprehensive, multi-lake, freshwater fisheries science program; (2) work cooperatively with regional, state, tribal, and local governments; and (3) consult with interested groups, including academia and Canadian agencies. The USGS may provide deepwater ecosystem research, fish behavior and habitat reports, fish population assessments, invasive species research, use of biological equipment and laboratory capabilities necessary to support fishery management decisions, and studies that assess impacts on Great Lakes fishery resources.
Title
Great Lakes Fishery Research Authorization Act
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1023 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 219.
SB3051 (Related) 2020-10-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-188. (TXT | PDF)
HB1865 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-94. (TXT | PDF)
SB3051 (Related) 2020-10-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-188. (TXT | PDF)
HB1865 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-94. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Aquatic ecology
Canada
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Fishes
Government studies and investigations
Great Lakes
International organizations and cooperation
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Canada
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Fishes
Government studies and investigations
Great Lakes
International organizations and cooperation
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/446/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s446/BILLS-116s446is.pdf |