US SB4629 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

America LEADS Act America Labor, Economic competitiveness, Alliances, Democracy and Security Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

America LEADS Act America Labor, Economic competitiveness, Alliances, Democracy and Security Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-17SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Same As/Similar To

HB4331 (Related) 2020-01-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB5932 (Related) 2020-03-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB7000 (Related) 2020-05-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB7601 (Related) 2020-07-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB7980 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB592 (Related) 2019-06-11 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
SB939 (Related) 2020-06-15 - Held at the desk.
SB945 (Related) 2020-05-22 - Held at the desk.
SB2539 (Related) 2019-09-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB4493 (Related) 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2202 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
HB4551 (Related) 2019-09-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SB1558 (Related) 2019-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1824 (Related) 2019-06-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB3952 (Related) 2020-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB4629 (Related) 2020-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects

Advanced technology and technological innovations
Africa
Air quality
Alliances
Alternative and renewable resources
Arctic and polar regions
Area studies and international education
Arms control and nonproliferation
ASEAN countries
Asia
Business ethics
Buy American requirements
Canada
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Caribbean area
China
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Collective security
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Contracts and agency
Corporate finance and management
Currency
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Due process and equal protection
Education programs funding
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employment and training programs
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Europe
European Union
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international corporations
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Foreign loans and debt
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government studies and investigations
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Higher education
Hong Kong
Human rights
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intellectual property
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International law and treaties
International monetary system and foreign exchange
International organizations and cooperation
Internet and video services
Iran
Japan
Judicial procedure and administration
Labor standards
Latin America
Manufacturing
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Metals
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military education and training
Military operations and strategy
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Minority employment
Multilateral development programs
Navigation, waterways, harbors
News media and reporting
Nuclear power
Nuclear weapons
Office of the U.S. Trade Representative
Oil and gas
Public contracts and procurement
Public-private cooperation
Religion
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Science and engineering education
South Korea
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Space flight and exploration
Student aid and college costs
Subversive activities
Taiwan
Tariffs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Tibet
Trade agreements and negotiations
Trade secrets and economic espionage
Transportation safety and security
U.S. Agency for Global Media
U.S. and foreign investments
Visas and passports
Wages and earnings
Water use and supply
Women's employment
World health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback