US SB4632 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 17, United States Code, to establish an alternative dispute resolution program for copyright small claims, to amend the Communications Act of 1934 to modify the scope of protection from civil liability for "good Samaritan" blocking and screening of offensive material, and for other purposes.
Title
Online Content Policy Modernization Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB4534 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB2426 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 266.
SB1273 (Related) 2019-09-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 206.
HB2426 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 266.
SB1273 (Related) 2019-09-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 206.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4632/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4632/BILLS-116s4632is.pdf |