US SB5085 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-30 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 644.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-30 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 644.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the amounts of the 2020 recovery rebate, repeals the immunity from liability of a provider or user of an interactive computer service for screening and blocking offensive content, and addresses the administration of federal elections. The bill increases the amount of the 2020 recovery rebate for individual taxpayers to $2,000 ($4,000 for joint returns). The amount of such rebate is phased out for taxpayers whose adjusted gross income exceeds $75,000 ($150,000 for joint returns). A recovery rebate is a stimulus payment for taxpayers and their dependents who are adversely affected by COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). also removes the immunity from liability of a provider or user of an interactive computer service (e.g., a social media company) for screening and blocking offensive content on its platform. Regarding the conduct of federal elections, the bill establishes a bipartisan advisory committee within the Election Assistance Commission (EAC) to study the integrity and administration of the November 2020 general election. Under the bill, each chief state election official must disclose to the EAC the identity of any foreign national known by that official to have (1) physically handled either ballots used in an election for federal office or voting machines, (2) had unmonitored access to a storage facility or centralized voting-tabulation location used to support an election, or (3) had unmonitored access to election-related information or communications technology. It also requires the official to make the disclosure within 30 days of becoming aware of such activity.
Title
A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to increase the additional 2020 recovery rebates, to repeal section 230 of the Communications Act of 1934, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 644. |
2020-12-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. (text: CR S7968-7969) |
Same As/Similar To
SB2656 (Related) 2019-10-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB4895 (Related) 2020-11-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB4895 (Related) 2020-11-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Civil actions and liability
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Election Assistance Commission
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Income tax credits
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Internet and video services
Postal service
State and local government operations
Subversive activities
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Civil actions and liability
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Election Assistance Commission
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Income tax credits
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Internet and video services
Postal service
State and local government operations
Subversive activities
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/5085/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s5085/BILLS-116s5085pcs.pdf |