US SB638 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-6-3)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1599)
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1599)
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Environmental Protection Agency to designate all perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances as hazardous substances within one year of enactment of this bill.
Title
PFAS Action Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1599) |
Same As/Similar To
HB535 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HR779 (Similar To) 2020-01-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3227 (Related) 2020-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HR779 (Similar To) 2020-01-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3227 (Related) 2020-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/638/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s638/BILLS-116s638is.pdf |