US SB659 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 130.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 130.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Reclamation States Emergency Drought Relief Act of 1991 to extend authorities and the authorization of appropriations under such Act through FY2018.
Title
A bill to reauthorize the Reclamation States Emergency Drought Relief Act of 1991, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 130. |
2013-07-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden with an amendment. With written report No. 113-73. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-32. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2337) |
Same As/Similar To
HB518 (Related) 2013-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
HB3176 (Related) 2013-10-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB3176 (Related) 2013-10-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Disaster relief and insurance
Natural disasters
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Natural disasters
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water use and supply