US SB66 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S103-104)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Assault Weapons Ban of 2019 This bill makes it a crime to knowingly import, sell, manufacture, transfer, or possess a semiautomatic assault weapon (SAW) or large capacity ammunition feeding device (LCAFD). The prohibition does not apply to a firearm that is (1) manually operated by bolt, pump, lever, or slide action; (2) permanently inoperable; (3) an antique; or (4) a rifle or shotgun specifically identified by make and model. The bill also exempts from the prohibition the following, with respect to a SAW or LCAFD: importation, sale, manufacture, transfer, or possession related to certain law enforcement efforts, or authorized tests or experiments; importation, sale, transfer, or possession related to securing nuclear materials; and possession by a retired law enforcement officer. The bill permits continued possession, sale, or transfer of a grandfathered SAW, which must be securely stored. A licensed gun dealer must conduct a background check prior to the sale or transfer of a grandfathered SAW between private parties. The bill permits continued possession of, but prohibits sale or transfer of, a grandfathered LCAFD. Newly manufactured LCAFDs must display serial number identification. Newly manufactured SAWs and LCAFDs must display the date of manufacture. The bill also allows a state or local government to use Edward Byrne Memorial Justice Assistance Grant Program funds to compensate individuals who surrender a SAW or LCAFD under a buy-back program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assault Weapons Ban of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-09SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S103-104)

Same As/Similar To

HB1186 (Related) 2019-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB447 (Related) 2019-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1296 (Related) 2019-02-15 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB2959 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback