US SB679 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the treatment of certain veterans' benefits in bankruptcy. Specifically, the bill excludes from a debtor's current monthly income certain benefits, including disability benefits, paid by the Department of Veterans Affairs or the Department of Defense.
Title
HAVEN Act Honoring American Veterans in Extreme Need Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2938 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-52. (TXT | PDF)
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Bankruptcy
Disability assistance
Finance and financial sector
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Disability assistance
Finance and financial sector
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/679/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s679/BILLS-116s679is.pdf |