US SB816 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stewardship End Result Contracting Project Act - Amends the Omnibus Public Land Management Act of 2009 to authorize the Forest Service and the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) to enter into stewardship contracting projects with private persons or other public or private entities to perform services to achieve land management goals for eligible land that meets local and rural community needs. States that the land management goals of a project may include: (1) road and trail maintenance or obliteration to restore or maintain water quality; (2) soil productivity, habitat for wildlife and fisheries, or other resource values; (3) setting of prescribed fires to improve the composition, structure, condition, and health of stands or to improve wildlife habitat; (4) removing vegetation or other activities to promote healthy forest stands, reduce fire hazards, or achieve other land management objectives; (5) watershed restoration and maintenance; (6) restoration and maintenance of wildlife and fish; or (7) control of noxious and exotic weeds and reestablishing native plant species. Defines "eligible land" to mean land located on National Forest System land or Bureau of Land Management [BLM]) land located west of the 100th meridian. Repeals a section of the Department of the Interior and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 1999 that provides for forest health protection.
Title
Stewardship End Result Contracting Project Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Udall [D-CO] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB10 (Related) 2013-01-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. (text of measure as introduced: CR S48-156)
SB849 (Related) 2013-04-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB954 (Related) 2013-09-04 - By Senator Stabenow from Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2013. Report No. 113-88. Additional views filed.
SB1300 (Related) 2014-06-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 406.
SB849 (Related) 2013-04-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB954 (Related) 2013-09-04 - By Senator Stabenow from Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2013. Report No. 113-88. Additional views filed.
SB1300 (Related) 2014-06-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 406.
Subjects
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Ecology
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Fires
Forests, forestry, trees
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Pest management
Public contracts and procurement
Public lands and natural resources
Rural conditions and development
Water quality
Watersheds
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Ecology
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Fires
Forests, forestry, trees
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Pest management
Public contracts and procurement
Public lands and natural resources
Rural conditions and development
Water quality
Watersheds
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/816/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s816/BILLS-113s816is.pdf |