US SB825 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 115-326.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 115-326.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Southeast Alaska Regional Health Consortium Land Transfer Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to convey specified property in Sitka, Alaska, to the Southeast Alaska Regional Health Consortium for use in connection with health and social services programs. Such conveyance shall not require any consideration from, or impose any obligation, term, or condition on, the consortium or allow for any U.S. reversionary interest in the property. (Sec. 4) The consortium shall not be liable for any environmental contamination that occurred before such conveyance.
Title
Southeast Alaska Regional Health Consortium Land Transfer Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-11 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 430 (Y: 403 N: 3 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-18 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-326. |
2018-12-18 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-12-13 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-12-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 3 (Roll no. 430). |
2018-12-11 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10084-10085) |
2018-12-10 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-12-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 825. |
2018-12-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9789-9790; text: CR H9789) |
2018-12-10 | House | Mr. Young (AK) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-04-05 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 472. |
2018-04-05 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-619, Part I. |
2017-12-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-12-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-11-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-30 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-11-30 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7498; text: CR S7498) |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 247. |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-173. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1901 (Same As) 2017-06-07 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Alaska
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Health facilities and institutions
Land transfers
Minority health
Pollution liability
Public lands and natural resources
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Health facilities and institutions
Land transfers
Minority health
Pollution liability
Public lands and natural resources