US SB832 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Pending: House Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to nullify the Supplemental Treaty Between the United States of America and the Confederated Tribes and Bands of Indians of Middle Oregon, concluded on November 15, 1865.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to nullify the Supplemental Treaty Between the United States of America and the Confederated Tribes and Bands of Indians of Middle Oregon, concluded on November 15, 1865.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
2019-06-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-06-28HouseReceived in the House.
2019-06-28SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-06-27SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4652-4664; text: CR S4652)
2019-06-10SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 110.
2019-06-10SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-45.
2019-05-15SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-05-01SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held.
2019-03-14SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB1803 (Same As) 2019-06-05 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback