US SB922 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the transfer of an F-35 aircraft to Turkey and various activities related to such a transfer. The prohibition may be waived if the President certifies to Congress that Turkey does not intend to accept delivery of the S-400 air defense system, which Turkey has agreed to buy from Russia.
Title
Protecting NATO Skies Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1102 (Related) 2019-07-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 142.
HB2512 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB2913 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB3263 (Same As) 2019-06-13 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB2512 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB2913 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB3263 (Same As) 2019-06-13 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Alliances
Asia
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign loans and debt
Government lending and loan guarantees
International affairs
International monetary system and foreign exchange
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Russia
Sanctions
Trade restrictions
Turkey
U.S. and foreign investments
Visas and passports
Asia
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign loans and debt
Government lending and loan guarantees
International affairs
International monetary system and foreign exchange
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Russia
Sanctions
Trade restrictions
Turkey
U.S. and foreign investments
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/922/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s922/BILLS-116s922is.pdf |