US SB932 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-19 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-19 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Putting Veterans Funding First Act of 2013 - Authorizes the provision of advance appropriations for the following discretionary (under current law, medical care) accounts of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA): (1) Veterans Health Administration Medical Services, Medical Support and Compliance, Medical Facilities, and Medical Research and Support; (2) National Cemetery Administration; and (3) Veterans Benefits Administration, Native American Veteran Housing Loan Program. Authorizes the provision of advance appropriations for the following VA discretionary administration accounts: (1) general operating expenses, (2) information technology systems, (3) the Office of the Inspector General, (4) construction for major and minor projects, and (5) grants for the construction of state extended care facilities and veterans cemeteries.
Title
Putting Veterans Funding First Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] |
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-19 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-111. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB813 (Same As) 2013-09-17 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 156.
Subjects
Appropriations
Armed forces and national security
Building construction
Cemeteries and funerals
Computers and information technology
Department of Veterans Affairs
Executive agency funding and structure
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Health facilities and institutions
Indian social and development programs
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medical research
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
Armed forces and national security
Building construction
Cemeteries and funerals
Computers and information technology
Department of Veterans Affairs
Executive agency funding and structure
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Health facilities and institutions
Indian social and development programs
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medical research
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/932/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s932/BILLS-113s932is.pdf |