US SB932 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-07-18 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-07-18 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 5, United States Code, to provide for the halt in pension payments for Members of Congress sentenced for certain offenses, and for other purposes.
Title
No CORRUPTION Act No Congressionally Obligated Recurring Revenue Used as Pensions To Incarcerated Officials Now Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-18 | House | Held at the desk. |
2023-07-18 | House | Received in the House. |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2962; text: CR S2962) |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 83. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. With written report No. 118-37. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5725 (Same As) 2023-09-26 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Accountability, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.