US SB978 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Director of the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) to report annually to Congress regarding all assessed and voluntary U.S. contributions to the United Nations (U.N.) and its affiliated agencies and related bodies during the previous fiscal year. Requires the report to include the following: (1) the total amount of all assessed and voluntary U.S. contributions to the U.N. and its affiliated agencies and related bodies; (2) the approximate percentage of U.S. contributions to each such agency or body in a fiscal year when compared with all such contributions in that fiscal year; and (3) the amount, description, and purpose of each contribution, the identity of the donating U.S. department or agency, and the identity of the recipient U.N. agency or body. Requires OMB to post a version of such report on a publicly available Internet website.
Title
A bill to provide for an accounting of total United States contributions to the United Nations.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2099 (Related) 2013-05-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SB988 (Related) 2013-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB1313 (Related) 2013-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB2848 (Related) 2013-09-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB988 (Related) 2013-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB1313 (Related) 2013-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB2848 (Related) 2013-09-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Foreign aid and international relief
Government information and archives
International affairs
United Nations
Foreign aid and international relief
Government information and archives
International affairs
United Nations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/978/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s978/BILLS-113s978is.pdf |