US SCR50 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution providing for an adjournment of the House of Representatives. Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Friday, July 15, 2016, through Friday, September 2, 2016, it stand adjourned until 2 p.m. on Tuesday, September 6, 2016.
Title
A concurrent resolution providing for an adjournment of the House of Representatives.
Sponsors
Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-07-25 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H5033) |
2016-07-25 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H5033) |
2016-07-18 | House | Held at the desk. |
2016-07-18 | House | Received in the House. |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5194-5195; text as passed Senate: CR S5178) |