US SJR29 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 352.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 352.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorization for Use of Military Force Against the Islamic State of Iraq and the Levant and its Associated Forces This joint resolution authorizes the President to use all necessary and appropriate force to defend U.S. national security against the threat posed by the Islamic State of Iraq and the Levant (ISIL), its associated forces, organizations, and persons, and any successor organizations. Congress declares that this joint resolution is intended to constitute specific statutory authorization within the meaning of section 5(b) of the War Powers Resolution. Nothing in this joint resolution supersedes any requirement of the War Powers Resolution. The President shall report to Congress at least every 60 days on matters relevant to this joint resolution.
Title
Authorization for Use of Military Force Against the Islamic State of Iraq and the Levant and its Associated Forces
Sponsors
Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Daniel Coats [R-IN] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 352. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. (text of measure as introduced: CR S133-134) |
Same As/Similar To
HCR106 (Related) 2016-01-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SJR26 (Related) 2015-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SJR26 (Related) 2015-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
International affairs
Iraq
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Syria
Terrorism
War and emergency powers
Congressional oversight
International affairs
Iraq
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Syria
Terrorism
War and emergency powers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-joint-resolution/29/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/sjres29/BILLS-114sjres29pcs.pdf |