US SJR34 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 690.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 690.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
States that Congress favors the proposed agreement for cooperation between the United States and the Russian Federation pursuant to the Atomic Energy Act of 1954 and transmitted to Congress by the President on May 10, 2010.
Title
A joint resolution relating to the approval of the proposed agreement for nuclear cooperation between the United States and the Russian Federation.
Sponsors
Sen. John Kerry [D-MA] | Sen. Richard Lugar [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-14 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 690. | |
2010-12-14 | Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 2159. (consideration: CR S9021) | |
2010-06-21 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations for a period not to exceed 45 session days pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 2159. | |
2010-06-21 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5211) |
Same As/Similar To
HJR85 (Related) 2010-05-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HJR91 (Same As) 2010-06-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HJR92 (Related) 2010-06-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HJR91 (Same As) 2010-06-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HJR92 (Related) 2010-06-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Subjects
Energy research
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Nuclear power
Russia
Trade agreements and negotiations
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Nuclear power
Russia
Trade agreements and negotiations