US SJR4 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 335.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 335.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This joint resolution requires either the advice and consent of the Senate or an act of Congress before the President may suspend, terminate, denounce, or withdraw the United States from the North Atlantic Treaty. No funds shall be authorized or appropriated to support any efforts to suspend, terminate, denounce, or withdraw from the treaty without the approval of both the Senate and the House of Representatives by a two-thirds vote or an act of Congress. The President shall notify Congress in writing of any effort to suspend, terminate, denounce, or withdraw from the treaty no later than 48 hours after such action. This joint resolution also authorizes the Senate Legal Counsel and the General Counsel of the House of Representatives to represent Congress in judicial proceedings related to actions that are inconsistent with this resolution.
Title
A joint resolution requiring the advice and consent of the Senate or an Act of Congress to suspend, terminate, or withdraw the United States from the North Atlantic Treaty and authorizing related litigation, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] |
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 335. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S295) |
Same As/Similar To
HJR41 (Same As) 2019-02-04 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Alliances
Appropriations
Civil actions and liability
Collective security
Congressional oversight
Europe
International affairs
International law and treaties
Judicial review and appeals
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Appropriations
Civil actions and liability
Collective security
Congressional oversight
Europe
International affairs
International law and treaties
Judicial review and appeals
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents