US SJR42 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional Amendment - States that the liberty of parents to direct the upbringing, education, and care of their children is a fundamental right. States that neither the United States nor any state shall infringe upon this right without demonstrating that its governmental interest, as applied to the person, is of the highest order and not otherwise served. Prohibits this article from being construed to apply to a parental action or decision that would end life. Declares that no treaty may be adopted nor shall any source of international law be employed to supersede, modify, interpret, or apply to the rights guaranteed by this amendment.
Title
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States relative to parental rights.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim DeMint [R-SC] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Saxby Chambliss [R-GA] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR3 (Related) 2011-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
HJR107 (Related) 2012-04-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
HJR110 (Same As) 2012-07-18 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HJR107 (Related) 2012-04-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
HJR110 (Same As) 2012-07-18 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Child care and development
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Elementary and secondary education
Families
Family relationships
International law and treaties
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Elementary and secondary education
Families
Family relationships
International law and treaties
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-joint-resolution/42/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/sjres42/BILLS-112sjres42is.pdf |