US SR111 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-25 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1894)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-25 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1894)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating March 2015 as "National Middle Level Education Month". Designates March 2015 as National Middle Level Education Month. Recognizes the importance of middle level education and the contributions of the individuals who educate middle level students.
Title
A resolution designating March 2015 as "National Middle Level Education Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1894) |
Same As/Similar To
HR153 (Related) 2015-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR404 (Related) 2016-04-25 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
HR663 (Related) 2016-03-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR404 (Related) 2016-04-25 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
HR663 (Related) 2016-03-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-resolution/111/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/sres111/BILLS-114sres111is.pdf |