US SR160 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2589; text as passed Senate: CR S2580-2581)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2589; text as passed Senate: CR S2580-2581)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that public servants should be commended for their dedication and continued service to the United States during Public Service Recognition Week. Expresses support for the designation of the week of May 3 through May 9, 2015, as Public Service Recognition Week. Commends public servants, government employees, and members of the uniformed services for their public service and honors those who have given their lives in service. Calls upon a new generation to consider a career in public service as an honorable profession. Encourages efforts to promote public service careers at all levels of government.
Title
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that public servants should be commended for their dedication and continued service to the United States during Public Service Recognition Week.
Sponsors
Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] |
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Kelly Ayotte [R-NH] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] |
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2589; text as passed Senate: CR S2580-2581) |
Same As/Similar To
HR242 (Related) 2015-04-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HR676 (Related) 2016-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR441 (Related) 2016-04-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2463; text as passed Senate: CR S2462)
HR676 (Related) 2016-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR441 (Related) 2016-04-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2463; text as passed Senate: CR S2462)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Congressional tributes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-resolution/160/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/sres160/BILLS-114sres160ats.pdf |