US SR180 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2245-2246; text: CR S2229)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2245-2246; text: CR S2229)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution supporting the designation of the week of April 26 through April 30, 2021, as "National Specialized Instructional Support Personnel Appreciation Week".
Title
A resolution supporting the designation of the week of April 26 through April 30, 2021, as "National Specialized Instructional Support Personnel Appreciation Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2245-2246; text: CR S2229) |
Same As/Similar To
HR354 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HR1063 (Related) 2022-04-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR604 (Related) 2022-05-03 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: 4/28/2022 CR S2223-2224)
HR1063 (Related) 2022-04-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR604 (Related) 2022-05-03 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: 4/28/2022 CR S2223-2224)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/180/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres180/BILLS-117sres180ats.pdf |