US SR191 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-19 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3184)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-19 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3184)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates June 2011 as National Aphasia Awareness Month. Expresses support for efforts to increase awareness of aphasia and make the voices of people with aphasia heard.
Title
A resolution designating June 2011 as "National Aphasia Awareness Month" and supporting efforts to increase awareness of aphasia.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Johnson [D-SD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3184) |
Same As/Similar To
HR285 (Related) 2011-06-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR674 (Related) 2012-06-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR503 (Related) 2012-06-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4593-4594; text as passed Senate: CR S4593-4594; text of measured as introduced: CR S4463)
HR674 (Related) 2012-06-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR503 (Related) 2012-06-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4593-4594; text as passed Senate: CR S4593-4594; text of measured as introduced: CR S4463)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Disability and paralysis
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Hearing, speech, and vision care
Neurological disorders
Disability and paralysis
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Hearing, speech, and vision care
Neurological disorders
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-resolution/191/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/sres191/BILLS-112sres191is.pdf |