US SR225 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-02 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-02 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating July 22, 2017, as "National Day of the American Cowboy". Designates July 22, 2017, as National Day of the American Cowboy.
Title
A resolution designating July 22, 2017, as "National Day of the American Cowboy".
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4715-4716) |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4118) |
Same As/Similar To
SR589 (Related) 2018-07-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5312; text: CR S5269)
Subjects
Arts, culture, religion
Commemorative events and holidays
Migrant, seasonal, agricultural labor
U.S. history
Commemorative events and holidays
Migrant, seasonal, agricultural labor
U.S. history