US SR231 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-13 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR 6/5/2019 S3261)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-13 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR 6/5/2019 S3261)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution condemns the attack on the Chabad of Poway Synagogue near San Diego, California, on April 27, 2019. It honors the memory of Lori Gilbert Kaye, who was killed. It expresses hope for recovery of the three individuals who were injured.
Title
A resolution condemning the horrific anti-Semitic attack on the Chabad of Poway Synagogue near San Diego, California, on April 27, 2019.
Sponsors
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR 6/5/2019 S3261) |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3626) |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HR364 (Related) 2019-05-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Subjects
California
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Hate crimes
Health personnel
Law enforcement officers
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Violent crime
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Hate crimes
Health personnel
Law enforcement officers
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Violent crime