US SR233 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4695; text: 7/26/2017 CR S4310)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4695; text: 7/26/2017 CR S4310)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating August 16, 2017, as "National Airborne Day". Designates August 16, 2017, as National Airborne Day.
Title
A resolution designating August 16, 2017, as "National Airborne Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] |
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Bob Corker [R-TN] |
Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-01 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4695; text: 7/26/2017 CR S4310) |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4310) |
Same As/Similar To
SR608 (Related) 2018-08-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5701; text: CR S5695)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Commemorative events and holidays
Military history
Military personnel and dependents