US SR346 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5760; text: CR S5753-5754)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5760; text: CR S5753-5754)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates October 8, 2019, as National Hydrogen and Fuel Cell Day.
Title
A resolution designating October 8, 2019, as "National Hydrogen and Fuel Cell Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5760; text: CR S5753-5754) |
Same As/Similar To
HR615 (Related) 2019-10-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR1158 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR720 (Related) 2020-09-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5881; text: CR S5876-5877)
HR1158 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR720 (Related) 2020-09-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5881; text: CR S5876-5877)
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Commemorative events and holidays
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Commemorative events and holidays
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/346/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres346/BILLS-116sres346ats.pdf |