US SR397 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-24 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5152; text: 10/4/2023 CR S4954)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-24 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5152; text: 10/4/2023 CR S4954)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating October 16, 2023, and October 16, 2024, as "World Food Day".
Title
A resolution designating October 16, 2023, and October 16, 2024, as "World Food Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-24 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5152; text: 10/4/2023 CR S4954) |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-10-04 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HR783 (Related) 2023-10-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.