US SR475 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 01/16/2020 CR S280)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution recognizing the leading role of Utahns in the fight for women's suffrage and celebrating the sesquicentennial of the first votes by women under the equal suffrage law of Utah on February 14, 1870. This resolution celebrates the 150th anniversary of women's suffrage in Utah. It also recognizes the leading role of Utahns in the fight for women's suffrage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution recognizing the leading role of Utahns in the fight for women's suffrage and celebrating the sesquicentennial of the first votes by women under the equal suffrage law of Utah on February 14, 1870.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 01/16/2020 CR S280)
2020-02-13SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1081)
2020-01-16SenateReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Same As/Similar To

HR804 (Same As) 2020-01-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback