US SR521 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-7-3)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1236; text: CR S1233-1234)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1236; text: CR S1233-1234)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates the week of February 24-February 28, 2020, as Public Schools Week.
Title
A resolution designating the week of February 24 through February 28, 2020, as "Public Schools Week".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1236; text: CR S1233-1234) |
Same As/Similar To
HR862 (Related) 2020-02-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR126 (Related) 2019-03-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2062; text: CR S2057)
SR126 (Related) 2019-03-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2062; text: CR S2057)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/521/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres521/BILLS-116sres521ats.pdf |