US SR574 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-13 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2430; text: CR S2424-2425)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-13 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2430; text: CR S2424-2425)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates April 18-April 26, 2020, as National Park Week. The resolution also encourages the people of the United States and the world to virtually visit, experience, and support the treasured national parks of the United States while protecting public health during the coronavirus pandemic.
Title
A resolution designating the week of April 18, 2020, through April 26, 2020, as "National Park Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-13 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2430; text: CR S2424-2425) |
Same As/Similar To
SR167 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2455; text: CR S2443)
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Commemorative events and holidays
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Travel and tourism
Commemorative events and holidays
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Travel and tourism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/574/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres574/BILLS-116sres574ats.pdf |