US SR739 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5998; text: CR S5986)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5998; text: CR S5986)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution (1) expresses support for the designation of the week of September 21-September 25, 2020, as National Family Service Learning Week, (2) recognizes the importance of family service learning in cultivating civic engagement and community investment, and (3) encourages the public to support family service learning and community development programs. Family service learning is a multigenerational problem-solving approach that utilizes active participation to meet community needs and develop the skillsets of children and families.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of the week of September 21 through September 25, 2020, as "National Family Service Learning Week".
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5998; text: CR S5986) |
Same As/Similar To
HR669 (Related) 2019-10-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HR1180 (Related) 2020-10-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR412 (Related) 2019-11-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6485; text: CR S6480-6481)
HR1180 (Related) 2020-10-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR412 (Related) 2019-11-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6485; text: CR S6480-6481)
Subjects
Adult education and literacy
Commemorative events and holidays
Community life and organization
Families
Family relationships
Public-private cooperation
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Commemorative events and holidays
Community life and organization
Families
Family relationships
Public-private cooperation
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/739/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres739/BILLS-116sres739ats.pdf |